EP0207713 - Corrosion inhibiting system containing alkoxylated amines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.1992 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.1992 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 02.09.1992 [1992/36] | 16.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.09.1992 [1992/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION 2000 Westchester Avenue White Plains New York 10650 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/02] | For all designated states TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION 2000 Westchester Avenue White Plains, New York 10650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Valone, Frederick William, Dr. 7130 Troulon Houston Texas 77074 / US | [1987/02] | Representative(s) | Wood, Anthony Charles, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 30 Welbeck Street London W1M 7PG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/26] | Wood, Anthony Charles, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 91 Wimpole Street London W1M 8AH / GB | ||
Former [1987/02] | Burnside, Michael Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 91 Wimpole Street London W1M 8AH / GB | Application number, filing date | 86304852.6 | 24.06.1986 | [1987/02] | Priority number, date | US19850751156 | 02.07.1985 Original published format: US 751156 | [1987/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0207713 | Date: | 07.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0207713 | Date: | 23.12.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0207713 | Date: | 11.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C23F11/14, E21B41/02 | [1987/02] | CPC: |
C23F11/173 (EP,US);
C23F11/141 (EP,US);
Y10S507/939 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1987/02] | Title | German: | Alkoxylierte Amine enthaltende korrosionsinhibierende Zusammensetzung | [1987/02] | English: | Corrosion inhibiting system containing alkoxylated amines | [1987/02] | French: | Composition inhibitrice de corrosion contenant des amines alcoxylées | [1987/02] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 04.06.1988 | Examination requested [1988/31] | 19.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.01.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.06.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 11.09.1991 | SE | 11.09.1991 | [1992/36] |
Former [1992/20] | SE | 11.09.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3310496 (MANSFIELD RICHARD COREY [US], et al); | [A]US3038856 (MILLIGAN JOHN G); | [A]US4348210 (SUNG RODNEY L); | [A]US3141905 (KERMIT LONGLEY); | [A]FR2124145 (PETROLITE CORP) |