EP0213697 - Polyether polyols, their manufacture ans use in polyurethanes production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.08.1992 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB | [1987/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brown, James Stijn Streuvelslaan 9 B-1960 Sterrebeek / BE | 02 /
May, Ronald Newman 460 Victoria Avenue Blackley Manchester M 93 PL / GB | 03 /
Randall, David Sparrenhof 11 B-3071 Erps Kwerps / BE | 04 /
Sparrow, David John Sterrebeeklaan 79 1980 Tervuren / BE | [1987/11] | Representative(s) | Leherte, Georges M.L.M., et al Intellectual Property Department ICI Polyurethanes Everslaan 45 3078 Everberg / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/11] | Leherte, Georges Maurice Lucien Marie, et al Intellectual Property Department ICI Polyurethanes Everslaan 45 B-3078 Everberg / BE | Application number, filing date | 86304857.5 | 24.06.1986 | [1987/11] | Priority number, date | GB19850016618 | 01.07.1985 Original published format: GB 8516618 | [1987/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0213697 | Date: | 11.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0213697 | Date: | 02.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C08G65/28, C08G18/48, C08G18/14, C08G18/40 | [1987/11] | CPC: |
C07D319/06 (EP,US);
C08G18/4883 (EP,US);
C08G65/2606 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/11] | Title | German: | Polyetherpolyole, ihre Herstellung sowie ihre Verwendung bei der Herstellung von Polyurethanen | [1987/11] | English: | Polyether polyols, their manufacture ans use in polyurethanes production | [1987/11] | French: | Polyétherpolyols, leur préparation et utilisation dans la préparation de polyuréthanes | [1987/11] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 08.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/24] | 24.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.05.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1992/40] | 17.05.1992 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1992/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1992 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP53002411 ; | [A]US2866774 (PRICE CHARLES C); | [X]FR2269550 (PROGIL BAYER UGINE [FR]); | [A]EP0060430 (GOLDSCHMIDT AG TH [DE]); | [A]FR2508917 (UNIV MANCHESTER [GB]); | [XP]EP0153031 (ICI PLC [GB]) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 88, no. 22, 29th May 1978, page 33, no. 153477c, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-53 002 411 (RIKEN VITAMIN OIL CO., LTD) 11-01-1978, & JP53002411 A 00000000 |