EP0207794 - Silver halide photographic material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/02] | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2, Nishi-shinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kida, Shuji 6-5-2 Tamadaira No. 323 Hino-shi Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Yoshimoto, Shinji 4-15-8 Nishiogikita Suginami-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Kaneko, Yutaka 825-15 Sagamihara Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Masuda, Kosaku 5-16-2-106 Tamagawa-cho Akishima-shi Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Kadokura, Kenji 79-2 Osaki-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo / JP | [1987/02] | Representative(s) | Ellis-Jones, Patrick George Armine, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/02] | Ellis-Jones, Patrick George Armine, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 86305155.3 | 03.07.1986 | [1987/02] | Priority number, date | JP19850147456 | 04.07.1985 Original published format: JP 14745685 | [1987/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0207794 | Date: | 07.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0207794 | Date: | 04.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0207794 | Date: | 14.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G03C7/38, G03C7/30 | [1987/02] | CPC: |
G03C7/301 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/02] | Title | German: | Photographisches Silberhalogenidmaterial | [1987/02] | English: | Silver halide photographic material | [1987/02] | French: | Matériau photographique à l'halogénure d'argent | [1987/02] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 18.04.1988 | Examination requested [1988/24] | 18.01.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.01.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 17.05.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/45] | Request for further processing for: | 23.03.1990 | Request for further processing filed | 23.03.1990 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.05.1990 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 14.11.1990 | GB | 03.07.1991 | [2006/14] |
Former [1992/34] | FR | 12.04.1991 | |
GB | 03.07.1991 | ||
Former [1992/01] | FR | 12.04.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2617826 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [X]EP0032699 (AGFA GEVAERT AG [DE]); | [Y]DE1810464 (EASTMAN KODAK CO); | [Y]EP0081768 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) | Examination | EP0201033 |