EP0207799 - Improved coolant passage structure for rotor blades in a combustion turbine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.09.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15235 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/02] | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15235 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Holden, Paul Clarence 137 Hunt Club Lane Newtown Square Pennsylvania 19073 / US | [1987/02] | Representative(s) | Van Berlyn, Ronald Gilbert 30 The Green Calne Wiltshire SN11 8DJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/02] | van Berlyn, Ronald Gilbert 23, Centre Heights London NW3 6JG / GB | Application number, filing date | 86305182.7 | 03.07.1986 | [1987/02] | Priority number, date | US19850751657 | 03.07.1985 Original published format: US 751657 | [1987/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0207799 | Date: | 07.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0207799 | Date: | 14.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/18 | [1987/02] | CPC: |
F01D5/187 (EP);
F05D2250/231 (EP);
F05D2250/232 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1987/02] | Title | German: | Kühlkanäle für die Schaufeln einer Gasturbine | [1987/02] | English: | Improved coolant passage structure for rotor blades in a combustion turbine | [1987/02] | French: | Canaux de refroidissement pour les aubes d'une turbine à gaz | [1987/02] | File destroyed: | 12.05.1995 | Examination procedure | 15.03.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/43] | 02.06.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1989/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 07.04.1989 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1989 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3301528 |