EP0210025 - 5-Substituted-6-aminopyrimidine derivatives, composition and uses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.02.1992 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states American Home Products Corporation Five Giralda Farms Madison, New Jersey 07940-0874 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/05] | For all designated states AMERICAN HOME PRODUCTS CORPORATION Five Giralda Farms Madison, New Jersey 07940-0874 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bagli, Jehan Framroz 7 Cleveland Lane RD No. 4 Princeton New Jersey 08540 / US | 02 /
Peseckis, Steven Michael 1970 New Rodgers Rd. Apt. 6-8 Levittown Pennsylvania 19056 / US | [1987/05] | Representative(s) | Wileman, David Francis, et al C/o John Wyeth and Brother Limited Huntercombe Lane South Taplow Maidenhead Berkshire SL6 OPH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/05] | Wileman, David Francis, et al c/o John Wyeth and Brother Limited Huntercombe Lane South Taplow Maidenhead Berkshire SL6 OPH / GB | Application number, filing date | 86305331.0 | 11.07.1986 | [1987/05] | Priority number, date | US19850757214 | 19.07.1985 Original published format: US 757214 | [1987/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0210025 | Date: | 28.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0210025 | Date: | 21.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07D239/46, C07D401/12, C07D403/12, C07D405/12, A61K31/505 | [1987/05] | CPC: |
C07D239/47 (EP,KR,US);
A61P9/04 (EP);
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
C07D403/12 (EP,US);
C07D405/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/05] | Title | German: | 5-Substituierte-6-Aminopyrimidinderivate, Zusammenstellung und Verwendungen | [1987/05] | English: | 5-Substituted-6-aminopyrimidine derivatives, composition and uses | [1987/05] | French: | Dérivés de 6-amino-pyrimidine substitués en 5, compositions et utilisations | [1987/05] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 15.04.1988 | Examination requested [1988/24] | 18.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/15] | 13.11.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1991 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DD72790 ; | [A]EP0130735 (AMERICAN HOME PROD [US]) | [AD] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 74, 1971, page 373, abstract no. 53838p, Columbus, Ohio, US; & DD-A-72 790 (G. THOMAS et al.) 05-05-1970, & DD72790 A 00000000 |