EP0209345 - High pressure metal vapor discharge lamp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.1992 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.1993 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 24.11.1993 [1993/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/04] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sasaki, Hiroki Patent Division Toshiba Corp. Principal Office 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Saita, Kiyoshi Patent Division Toshiba Corp. Principal Office 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Inoue, Akihiro Patent Division Toshiba Corp. Principal Office 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Takanishi, Hiroyoshi Patent Division Toshiba Corp. Principal Office 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Kuno, Nobuyoshi Patent Division Toshiba Corp. Principal Office 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1987/04] | Representative(s) | Kirk, Geoffrey Thomas, et al BATCHELLOR, KIRK & CO. 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/04] | Kirk, Geoffrey Thomas, et al BATCHELLOR, KIRK & CO. 2 Pear Tree Court Farringdon Road London EC1R 0DS / GB | Application number, filing date | 86305398.9 | 14.07.1986 | [1987/04] | Priority number, date | JP19850106968U | 15.07.1985 Original published format: JP 10696885 U | JP19850159516U | 18.10.1985 Original published format: JP 15951685 U | [1987/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0209345 | Date: | 21.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0209345 | Date: | 18.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0209345 | Date: | 22.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H01J61/52, H01J61/82 | [1987/04] | CPC: |
H01J61/52 (EP,US);
H01J61/827 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1987/04] | Title | German: | Hochdruckmetalldampfentladungslampe | [1987/04] | English: | High pressure metal vapor discharge lamp | [1987/04] | French: | Lampe à décharge à haute pression à vapeur métallique | [1987/04] | Examination procedure | 22.07.1986 | Examination requested [1987/04] | 14.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 04.06.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 10.06.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 14.07.1992 | SE | 15.07.1992 | [1993/47] |
Former [1993/19] | SE | 15.07.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2725970 (PATENT TREUHAND GES FUER ELEKTRISCHE GLUEHLAMPEN MBH); | [A]DE893554 (QUARZLAMPEN GMBH) |