EP0210792 - Diversity reception radio receiver [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 19.01.1995 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.1995 | Opposition rejected | published on 08.03.1995 [1995/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/06] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kojima, Tatsuru c/o NEC Corporation 33-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1987/06] | Representative(s) | Orchard, Oliver John JOHN ORCHARD & CO. Staple Inn Buildings North High Holborn London WC1V 7PZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/06] | Orchard, Oliver John JOHN ORCHARD & CO. Staple Inn Buildings North High Holborn London WC1V 7PZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 86305517.4 | 17.07.1986 | [1987/06] | Priority number, date | JP19850162734 | 22.07.1985 Original published format: JP 16273485 | [1987/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0210792 | Date: | 04.02.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0210792 | Date: | 19.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0210792 | Date: | 09.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/08 | [1987/06] | CPC: |
H04B7/082 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL, SE [1987/06] | Title | German: | Diversity-Funkempfänger | [1987/06] | English: | Diversity reception radio receiver | [1987/06] | French: | Récepteur radio en diversité | [1987/06] | Examination procedure | 15.08.1986 | Examination requested [1987/06] | 01.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.04.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 12.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.06.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
04.09.1993
03.11.1993
ADMISSIBLE Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte E.V. Bahnstrasse 62 D-40210 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/44] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.09.1993
03.11.1993
ADMISSIBLE Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte E.V. Bahnstrasse 62 D-40210 Düsseldorf / DE | 08.11.1993 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.03.1994 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 05.04.1994 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 03.06.1994 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 07.10.1994 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 17.10.1994 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1995/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP59167133 ; | [X]JP58064831 ; | [X]DE2558557 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO); | [E]EP0241793 (BLAUPUNKT WERKE GMBH [DE]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 19 (E-292)[1742], 25th January 1985; & JP-A-59 167 133 (MITSUBISHI DENKI K.K.) 20-09-84, & JP59167133 A 00000000 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 154 (E-185)[1299], 6th July 1983; & JP-A-58 064 831 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 18-04-1983, & JP58064831 A 00000000 |