EP0210057 - Railway vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.06.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WICKHAM LAND LIMITED 146 High Street Watton At Stone Hertfordshire SG14 3RZ / GB | For all designated states Cooper, James 146 High Street Watton At Stone Hertfordshire SG14 3RZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/05] | For all designated states WICKHAM LAND LIMITED 146 High Street Watton At Stone Hertfordshire SG14 3RZ / GB | ||
For all designated states Cooper, James 146 High Street Watton At Stone Hertfordshire SG14 3RZ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cooper, James 146 High Street Watton At Stone Hertfordshire SG14 3RZ / GB | [1987/05] | Representative(s) | Jones, Ian, et al W.P. Thompson & Co. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/05] | Jones, Ian, et al W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 86305533.1 | 18.07.1986 | [1987/05] | Priority number, date | GB19850018539 | 23.07.1985 Original published format: GB 8518539 | [1987/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0210057 | Date: | 28.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0210057 | Date: | 11.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B61C9/24, B61C3/00 | [1987/05] | CPC: |
B61C3/00 (EP);
B61C15/02 (EP);
B61C9/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/05] | Title | German: | Eisenbahnfahrzeug | [1987/05] | English: | Railway vehicle | [1987/05] | French: | Véhicule ferroviaire | [1987/05] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 13.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/12] | 02.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.02.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/31] | 07.03.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1991/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1990 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2021092 ; | [Y]DE1814117 ; | [A]US2342724 |