Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] |
12.06.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.07.1991 [1991/31] |
01.08.1989 | First examination report | |
01.02.1988 | Request for examination filed | published on 23.03.1988 [1988/12] |
21.09.1987 | Publication of search report | published on 11.11.1987 [1987/46] |
13.12.1986 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 28.01.1987 [1987/05] |