EP0213720 - Filler-containing polypropylene resin compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.10.1992 [1992/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541-8550 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/11] | For all designated states SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED Kitahama 4-chome 5-33 Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mitsuno, Tatsuyuki No. 1-9 Yushudainishi Ichihara-shi Chiba / JP | 02 /
Koyama, Teruhisa No. 8-16, Hoshigoe-cho Niihama-shi Ehime / JP | 03 /
Shinonaga, Hideo No. 285-172, Higashiterayama-cho Chiba-shi Chiba / JP | 04 /
Daimon, Akio No. 1-9, Yushudainishi Ichihara-shi Chiba / JP | [1987/11] | Representative(s) | Moore, Anthony John, et al Gee & Co. Chancery House Chancery Lane London WC2A 1QU / GB | [1987/11] | Application number, filing date | 86305705.5 | 24.07.1986 | [1987/11] | Priority number, date | JP19850165584 | 25.07.1985 Original published format: JP 16558485 | [1987/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0213720 | Date: | 11.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0213720 | Date: | 30.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0213720 | Date: | 06.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/12, C08K9/08 | [1987/11] | CPC: |
C08K3/34 (EP,US);
C08K9/08 (EP,US);
C08L23/08 (EP,US);
C08L23/10 (EP,US);
C08L33/04 (EP,US);
C08L35/00 (EP,US);
C08L23/0869 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/34, C08L23/10 (EP,US);
C08L23/10, C08L23/08, C08L33/04, C08L35/00, C08K9/08 (US,EP);
C08L23/10, C08L2666/06 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1987/11] | Title | German: | Gefüllte Polypropylenzusammensetzung | [1987/11] | English: | Filler-containing polypropylene resin compositions | [1987/11] | French: | Compositions de polypropylène chargé | [1987/11] | Examination procedure | 05.08.1988 | Examination requested [1988/40] | 21.12.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.05.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.08.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]BE898942 (NESTE OY); | [X]DE1769178 (BASF AG); | [X]EP0008143 (SOLVAY [BE]); | [A]EP0028085 (TOA NENRYO KOGYO KK [JP]); | [A]US4420580 (HERMAN JIM T [US], et al) |