EP0211580 - Renin inhibiting polypeptides and intermediates therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.03.1992 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pfizer Inc. 235 East 42nd Street New York, NY 10017 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/09] | For all designated states PFIZER INC. 235 East 42nd Street New York, N.Y. 10017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoover, Dennis Jay 5, Fargo Drive Ledyard Connecticut / US | [1987/09] | Representative(s) | Moore, James William Pfizer Limited Ramsgate Road Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/09] | Moore, James William, Dr. Pfizer Limited Ramsgate Road Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 86305722.0 | 25.07.1986 | [1987/09] | Priority number, date | US19850762099 | 02.08.1985 Original published format: US 762099 | US19850780353 | 26.09.1985 Original published format: US 780353 | [1987/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0211580 | Date: | 25.02.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0211580 | Date: | 09.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07K5/00, C07C125/065, A61K37/64, // C07K5/02 | [1987/09] | CPC: |
C07K5/0227 (EP,US);
C07K7/06 (KR);
C07K5/06078 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
Y10S530/86 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/09] | Title | German: | Polypeptide Hemmungsstoffe von Renin und deren Zwischenverbindungen | [1987/09] | English: | Renin inhibiting polypeptides and intermediates therefor | [1987/09] | French: | Polypeptides inhibiteurs de la rénine et leur intermédiaires | [1987/09] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 04.08.1986 | Examination requested [1987/09] | 19.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/18] | 28.11.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4240975 (AOYAGI TAKAAKI [JP], et al); | [Y]EP0104964 (SANOFI SA [FR], et al); | [A]WO8403044 (FERRING AB [SE], et al); | [E]GB2184730 (SQUIBB & SONS INC) | [Y] - JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, vol. 94, no. 8, 1972, pages 2855-2859; D. YAMASHIRO et al.: "The use of Nalpha,N-Bis(ter-butyloxycarbonyl)histidine and Nalpha-2-(p-Biphenylyl)isopropyloxycarbonyl-N-tert-butyloxy-carbonylhistidine in the Solid-Phase Synthesis of Histidine-Containing Peptides" |