Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
29.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.08.1991 [1991/34] |
14.07.1990 | (Expected) grant | published on 29.08.1990 [1990/35] |
29.08.1989 | Change - representative | published on 18.10.1989 [1989/42] |
12.04.1989 | First examination report | |
16.07.1987 | Request for examination filed | published on 02.09.1987 [1987/36] |
19.12.1986 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 04.02.1987 [1987/06] |