Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE55980T | 15.09.1990 | T1 | Priority number | Date | GB8519154 | 30.07.1985 | EP86305749 | 25.07.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0819062B | Global Dossier | 28.02.1996 | B2 | JPH06340597 | 13.12.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8519154 | 30.07.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU603987B | Global Dossier | 06.12.1990 | B2 | AU6002986 | 05.02.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8519154 | 30.07.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0210849 | Global Dossier | 29.08.1990 | B1 | EP0210849 | 04.02.1987 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB8519154 | 30.07.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR242176 | 31.03.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB8519154 | 30.07.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1283122 | 16.04.1991 | C | Priority number | Date | GB8519154 | 30.07.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1014516B | 30.10.1991 | B | CN86105400 | 11.03.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8519154 | 30.07.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CS266593 | 12.01.1990 | B2 | CS573586 | 14.04.1989 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB8519154 | 30.07.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DD251551 | 18.11.1987 | A5 | Priority number | Date | GB8519154 | 30.07.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3673722D1 | 04.10.1990 | D1 | Priority number | Date | GB8519154 | 30.07.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK168761B | 06.06.1994 | B1 | DK359986 | 31.01.1987 | A | DK359986D0 | 29.07.1986 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB8519154 | 30.07.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2002720 | 01.10.1988 | A6 | Priority number | Date | GB8519154 | 30.07.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI88030C | 25.03.1993 | C | FI88030B | 15.12.1992 | B | FI862896 | 31.01.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8519154 | 30.07.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB8519154D0 | 04.09.1985 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB8519154 | 30.07.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GR861994 | 26.11.1986 | B | Priority number | Date | GB8519154 | 30.07.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUT44757 | 28.04.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8519154 | 30.07.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IE60157 | 15.06.1994 | B1 | IE861827L | 30.01.1987 | L | Priority number | Date | GB8519154 | 30.07.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0651661B | 06.07.1994 | B2 | JPS6277357 | 09.04.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8519154 | 30.07.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR870001142 | 11.03.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8519154 | 30.07.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO170480C | 21.10.1992 | C | NO170480B | 13.07.1992 | B | NO863061L | 02.02.1987 | L | NO863061D0 | 29.07.1986 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB8519154 | 30.07.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ217011 | 26.02.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8519154 | 30.07.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PH22503 | 12.09.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8519154 | 30.07.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL152320B | 31.12.1990 | B1 | PL260759 | 15.09.1988 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB8519154 | 30.07.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT83085 | 30.01.1989 | B | PT83085 | 01.08.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8519154 | 30.07.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SU1632370 | 28.02.1991 | A3 | Priority number | Date | GB8519154 | 30.07.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4772631 | 20.09.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8519154 | 30.07.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA865097 | 25.03.1987 | B | Priority number | Date | GB8519154 | 30.07.1985 |