Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0257704 | Global Dossier | 02.03.1988 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75967985 | 29.07.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU7096887 | Global Dossier | 23.07.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | US75967985 | 29.07.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU6011786 | Global Dossier | 05.02.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | US75967985 | 29.07.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0210864 | Global Dossier | 04.02.1987 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75967985 | 29.07.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR8603506 | 04.03.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | US75967985 | 29.07.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS6228554 | 06.02.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | US75967985 | 29.07.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ216760 | 30.09.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | US75967985 | 29.07.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4726256 | 23.02.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | US75967985 | 29.07.1985 | Type | Divisional application | EP0257704 |