EP0214747 - Composite heat-insulating material containing a cellular urethane [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.1991 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.10.1991 [1991/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL CO., LTD. 5-2, 2-chome, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/12] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL CO., LTD. 5-2, 2-chome, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yazaki, Takao c/o Mitsubishi Petrochemical Co., Ltd. 1, Toho-cho Yokkaichi-shi Mie / JP | 02 /
Hattori, Satoru c/o Mitsubishi Petrochemical Co., Ltd. 1, Toho-cho Yokkaichi-shi Mie / JP | 03 /
Hattori, Kazuhide c/o Mitsubishi Petrochemical Co., Ltd. 1, Toho-cho Yokkaichi-shi Mie / JP | 04 /
Matsuno, Takumi c/o Mitsubishi Petrochemical Co., Ltd. 1, Toho-cho Yokkaichi-shi Mie / JP | 05 /
Shibuya, Nobuhiro c/o Mitsubishi Petrochemical Co., Ltd. 1, Toho-cho Yokkaichi-shi Mie / JP | 06 /
Hayama, Kazuhide c/o Mitsubishi Yuka Fine Chemicals Co., Ltd. 1, Toho-cho Yokkaichi-shi Mie / JP | 07 /
Itoh, Isao c/o Mitsubishi Yuka Fine Chemicals Co., Ltd. 1, Toho-cho Yokkaichi-shi Mie / JP | [1987/12] | Representative(s) | Diamond, Bryan Clive, et al Gee & Co. Chancery House Chancery Lane London WC2A 1QU / GB | [1987/12] | Application number, filing date | 86305870.7 | 30.07.1986 | [1987/12] | Priority number, date | JP19850168167 | 30.07.1985 Original published format: JP 16816785 | [1987/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0214747 | Date: | 18.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0214747 | Date: | 05.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0214747 | Date: | 17.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F25D23/08, B32B5/18, B32B27/40 | [1987/12] | CPC: |
B32B5/18 (EP,US);
B32B7/12 (US);
B32B27/065 (US);
B32B27/32 (US);
F25D23/064 (EP,US);
B32B2266/0278 (US);
B32B2323/10 (US);
Y10T428/249985 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249992 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1987/12] | Title | German: | Polyurethanschaumstoffenthaltendes zusammengestelltes wärmeisolierendes Material | [1987/12] | English: | Composite heat-insulating material containing a cellular urethane | [1987/12] | French: | Matériau composite isolant la chaleur et contenant du polyuréthane cellulaire | [1987/12] | Examination procedure | 16.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/21] | 22.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.04.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3467569 (WEBER CHRISTIAN A, et al); | [A]EP0079178 (RAYCHEM SA NV [BE]); | [APD]EP0150942 (MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP], et al) |