EP0213802 - Padlock [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.10.1990 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OGDEN INDUSTRIES PTY. LTD. Edward Street Huntingdale Victoria 3166 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [1987/11] | For all designated states OGDEN INDUSTRIES PTY. LTD. Edward Street Huntingdale Victoria 3166 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dunphy, Gerald Francis 56 Camelot Drive Glen Waverley Victoria 3150 / AU | 02 /
Newman, Donald John 13 Sullivan Drive Sommerville Victoria 3912 / AU | [1987/11] | Representative(s) | Moon, Donald Keith, et al BREWER & SON Quality House Quality Court Chancery Lane London WC2A 1HT / GB | [1987/11] | Application number, filing date | 86306086.9 | 06.08.1986 | [1987/11] | Priority number, date | AU19850001959 | 15.08.1985 Original published format: AU 195985 | [1987/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0213802 | Date: | 11.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0213802 | Date: | 30.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.1988 | Classification | IPC: | E05B67/38 | [1987/11] | CPC: |
E05B67/38 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1987/11] | Title | German: | Vorhängeschloss | [1987/11] | English: | Padlock | [1987/11] | French: | Cadenas | [1987/11] | File destroyed: | 20.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 03.05.1988 | Examination requested [1988/27] | 16.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/51] | 20.07.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1990/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1988 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.12.1988 | 31.08.1990 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4104894 ; | [A]US3751948 |