EP0219200 - Control of intaglio printing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.01.1990 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Foilwraps Flexible Packaging Limited Ross Road Weedon Road Estate Northampton NN5 5AX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/17] | For all designated states Foilwraps Flexible Packaging Limited Ross Road Weedon Road Estate Northampton NN5 5AX / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chudley, Robin William No. 1 Scotia Close Brackmills Estate Northampton NN4 OPH / GB | [1987/17] | Representative(s) | Gallafent, Richard John, et al Gallafents Ltd The Old Vicarage Stanbridge, Bedfordshire LU7 9HX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/17] | Gallafent, Richard John, et al GALLAFENT & CO. 8 Staple Inn London WCIV 7QH / GB | Application number, filing date | 86306092.7 | 06.08.1986 | [1987/17] | Priority number, date | GB19850024483 | 04.10.1985 Original published format: GB 8524483 | [1987/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0219200 | Date: | 22.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0219200 | Date: | 18.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G03F3/10 | [1987/17] | CPC: |
G03F3/101 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/17] | Title | German: | Tiefdruckberichtigungsverfahren | [1987/17] | English: | Control of intaglio printing | [1987/17] | French: | Vérification de l'impression en creux | [1987/17] | File destroyed: | 30.10.1997 | Examination procedure | 19.07.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/09] | 06.10.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1990/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 11.08.1989 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1989 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4310248 ; | [Y]FR1389165 ; | [Y]FR2386083 ; | [Y]EP0149424 ; | [A]EP0109183 |