EP0215567 - Production of 2,5-dimethyl-2,4-hexadiene [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.1991 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.06.1991 [1991/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541-8550 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/13] | For all designated states SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED Kitahama 4-chome 5-33 Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Higashio, Yasuhiko 3-11-11, Aobadai Ichihara-shi Chiba 272 / JP | 02 /
Takahashi, Kazuteru Kamiwasedaryo, 135, Iriyamazu Ichihara-shi Chiba 272 / JP | [1987/13] | Representative(s) | Sheard, Andrew Gregory, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/13] | Sheard, Andrew Gregory, et al Kilburn & Strode 30, John Street London WC1N 2DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 86306095.0 | 07.08.1986 | [1987/13] | Priority number, date | JP19850173815 | 07.08.1985 Original published format: JP 17381585 | JP19850297283 | 27.12.1985 Original published format: JP 29728385 | JP19860021697 | 03.02.1986 Original published format: JP 2169786 | JP19860101324 | 30.04.1986 Original published format: JP 10132486 | [1987/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0215567 | Date: | 25.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0215567 | Date: | 04.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C07C11/12, C07C2/86, C07C1/20 | [1987/13] | CPC: |
C07C1/20 (EP,US);
C07C2/867 (EP,US);
C07C2521/16 (EP,US);
C07C2523/20 (EP,US);
C07C2527/173 (EP,US);
C07C2529/04 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C1/20, C07C11/12 (EP,US);
C07C2/867, C07C11/12 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1987/13] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von 2,5-Dimethyl-2,4-hexadien | [1987/13] | English: | Production of 2,5-dimethyl-2,4-hexadiene | [1987/13] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de 2,5-diméthyl-2,4-hexadiène | [1987/13] | Examination procedure | 19.08.1987 | Examination requested [1987/43] | 23.03.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2152638 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO); | [X]GB826545 (BRITISH HYDROCARBON CHEM LTD); | [X]GB826546 (BRITISH HYDROCARBON CHEM LTD); | [X]GB852145 (BRITISH HYDROCARBON CHEM LTD); | [X]GB863136 (BRITISH HYDROCARBON CHEM LTD); | [X]GB863139 (BRITISH HYDROCARBON CHEM LTD); | [X]GB863330 (BRITISH HYDROCARBON CHEM LTD) |