EP0218333 - Bias circuit for fet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.1991 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.02.1992 [1992/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/16] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Asazawa, Hiroshi c/o NEC Corporation 33-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Hashimoto, Kazuya c/o NEC Corporation 33-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1987/16] | Representative(s) | Pears, David Ashley, et al REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [1987/16] | Application number, filing date | 86306254.3 | 13.08.1986 | [1987/16] | Priority number, date | JP19850178943 | 13.08.1985 Original published format: JP 17894385 | [1987/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0218333 | Date: | 15.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0218333 | Date: | 27.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H03F1/30 | [1987/16] | CPC: |
H03F3/16 (EP,US);
H03F1/306 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL, SE [1987/16] | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung für die Vorspannungsversorgung von Feldeffekttransistoren | [1987/16] | English: | Bias circuit for fet | [1987/16] | French: | Circuit de polarisation pour des transistors à effet de champ | [1987/16] | Examination procedure | 20.08.1986 | Examination requested [1987/16] | 23.05.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.08.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.11.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3017654 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [Y]DE2417994 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]US3875430 (PRAK JAN WILLEM L); | [A]DE2550636 (SONY CORP); | [A]DE2613937 (LICENTIA GMBH) |