EP0213921 - Modulation of virus-related events by double-stranded RNAs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.1991 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.07.1991 [1991/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HEM RESEARCH, INC. 12280 Wilkins Avenue P.O. Box 2245 Rockville, MD 20852 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/11] | For all designated states HEM RESEARCH, INC. 12280 Wilkins Avenue P.O. Box 2245 Rockville, MD 20852 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carter, William A. 1 Jaine Lane Birchrunville Pennsylvania 19421 / US | [1987/11] | Representative(s) | Smart, Peter John, et al Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/11] | Smart, Peter John, et al W.H. BECK, GREENER & CO 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 86306582.7 | 26.08.1986 | [1987/11] | Priority number, date | US19850769494 | 26.08.1985 Original published format: US 769494 | US19860886363 | 17.07.1986 Original published format: US 886363 | [1987/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0213921 | Date: | 11.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0213921 | Date: | 07.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0213921 | Date: | 08.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A61K37/66, A61K35/14, // (A61K37/66, 35:14, 31:70) | [1990/32] | CPC: |
A61K31/70 (EP);
A61K38/20 (EP);
A61K38/21 (EP);
A61L2/0082 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K38/20, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K38/20, A61K31/70 (EP);
A61K38/21, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K38/21, A61K31/70 (EP) |
Former IPC [1988/01] | A61K31/70, A61K35/14, A61K35/14, // (A61K45/02, 35:14, 31:70) | ||
Former IPC [1987/11] | A61K45/02, A61K35/14, // (A61K45/02, 35:14, 31:70) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/11] | Title | German: | Kontrolle virusbezogener Ereignisse durch ds-RNA | [1987/11] | English: | Modulation of virus-related events by double-stranded RNAs | [1987/11] | French: | Contrôle des événements relatifs aux virus par les ARN double brin | [1987/11] | Examination procedure | 31.03.1988 | Examination requested [1988/23] | 20.09.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 25.01.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 14.02.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0113162 (CARTER WILLIAM ALVIN [US], et al); | [A]GB1412591 (BEECHAM GROUP LTD) |