blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0213934

EP0213934 - Print head positioning apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.11.1992
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip05.11.1992No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.12.1992 [1992/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Seiko Epson Corporation
4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo-to / JP
[N/P]
Former [1987/11]For all designated states
SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION
4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome
Shinjuku-ku Tokyo-to / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Masahiro, Minowa C/o Seiko Epson Corp.
3-5 Owa, 3-chome
Suwa-shi Nagano-ken / JP
[1987/11]
Representative(s)Miller, Joseph, et al
J. MILLER & CO. 34 Bedford Row, Holborn
London WC1R 4JH / GB
[1987/11]
Application number, filing date86306649.428.08.1986
[1987/11]
Priority number, dateJP1985019076229.08.1985         Original published format: JP 19076285
JP1986004322228.02.1986         Original published format: JP 4322286
JP1986004322128.02.1986         Original published format: JP 4322186
JP1986004671204.03.1986         Original published format: JP 4671286
[1987/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0213934
Date:11.03.1987
Language:EN
[1987/11]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0213934
Date:22.06.1988
Language:EN
[1988/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0213934
Date:02.01.1992
Language:EN
[1992/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.05.1988
ClassificationIPC:B41J25/312
[1992/01]
CPC:
B41J25/312 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1987/11]B41J25/30
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1987/11]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Einstellung eines Druckkopfes[1987/11]
English:Print head positioning apparatus[1987/11]
French:Dispositif pour le positionnement d'une tête d'impression[1987/11]
Examination procedure23.11.1988Examination requested  [1989/03]
11.09.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.11.1990Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.03.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.06.1991Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.09.1991Fee for grant paid
19.09.1991Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.10.1992No opposition filed within time limit [1992/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.07.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
03.07.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
21.08.1990Renewal fee patent year 05
23.08.1991Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JP53070447  ;
 [A]US4173273  (HANAKATA TAKAYOSHI [JP]);
 [A]EP0115841  (HITACHI LTD [JP]);
 [A]CH651783  (TRIUMPH ADLER AG)
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Unexamined Applications, Section E, Vol. 2, No. 104, August 26, 1978 The Patent Office Japanese Government page 5 486 E 78 & JP-A-53 070 447 (CANON), & JP53070447 A 00000000
 [A]  - IBM Technical Disclosure Bulletin, Vol. 24, No. 7B, December 1981 S. DYER, D.A. WALKER "Printing Energy Control for a Thermal Printer" page 3 973
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.