Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0631419Y | 22.08.1994 | Y2 | JPS6242066U | 13.03.1987 | U | Priority number | Date | JP13304685 | 02.09.1985 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS6242065U | 13.03.1987 | U | Priority number | Date | JP13304585 | 02.09.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0215607 | Global Dossier | 15.05.1991 | B1 | EP0215607 | 25.03.1987 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP13304585 | 02.09.1985 | JP13304685 | 02.09.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3679265D1 | 20.06.1991 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP13304585 | 02.09.1985 | JP13304685 | 02.09.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4717464 | 05.01.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | JP13304585 | 02.09.1985 | JP13304685 | 02.09.1985 |