EP0215607 - Oxygen sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.1992 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.05.1992 [1992/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 4678530 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/13] | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oshima, Norio 22-7 Tokugawa 2-chome Higashi-Ku Nagoya City Aichi Pref. / JP | 02 /
Murase, Takao 69-1 Ohaza-Maeno Konan City Aichi Pref. / JP | 03 /
Oki, Shuichiro 2-1267 Aza-Minote Ohaza-Akaike Nisshin-Cho Aichi-Gun Aichi Pref. / JP | [1987/13] | Representative(s) | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/13] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 86306773.2 | 02.09.1986 | [1987/13] | Priority number, date | JP19850133045 | 02.09.1985 Original published format: JP 13304585 | JP19850133046 | 02.09.1985 Original published format: JP 13304685 | [1987/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0215607 | Date: | 25.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0215607 | Date: | 15.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/417 | [1991/20] | CPC: |
G01N27/4077 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1987/13] | G01N27/56 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/13] | Title | German: | Sauerstoffsensor | [1987/13] | English: | Oxygen sensor | [1987/13] | French: | Senseur d'oxygène | [1987/13] | Examination procedure | 17.10.1986 | Examination requested [1987/13] | 14.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.01.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.11.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.02.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4116797 (AKATSUKA TAKAO); | [A]DE2805598 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE); | [A]DE2811066 ; | [A]US4323440 (AKATSUKA TAKAO) |