EP0219956 - Video tape recorder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.08.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/18] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamanishi, Kazuhiro 3-121, Arakawa Higashiosaka-shi Osaka-fu, 577 / JP | 02 /
Kobayashi, Masaaki 1-224, Higashitouge, Nishitada Kawanishi-shi Hyogo-ken, 666-01 / JP | 03 /
Takeuchi, Akihiro 1175-16, 1-chome, Nakanabata Ikoma-shi Nara-ken, 630-02 / JP | 04 /
Ochi, Atsuo 307-go, 1-24, Syouji-cho Kadoma-shi Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | 05 /
Nagaoka, Yoshitomi 11-9, Naritaminamimachi Neyagawa-shi Osaka-fu, 572 / JP | [1987/18] | Representative(s) | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/18] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 86306842.5 | 04.09.1986 | [1987/18] | Priority number, date | JP19850196296 | 05.09.1985 Original published format: JP 19629685 | JP19850233635 | 18.10.1985 Original published format: JP 23363585 | [1987/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0219956 | Date: | 29.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/86 | [1987/18] | CPC: |
H04N5/78263 (EP,US);
H04N5/76 (KR);
H04N9/81 (EP,US);
H04N9/86 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/18] | Title | German: | Videobandaufzeichnungsgerät | [1987/18] | English: | Video tape recorder | [1987/18] | French: | Appareil d'enregistrement à bande vidéo | [1987/18] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 27.10.1987 | Examination requested [1988/01] | 07.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.04.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1991/38] | 04.05.1991 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1991/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0072507 [ ] (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | DE3339639 [ ] (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN [JP]) |