blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0217561

EP0217561 - Cargo-accommodating arrangements on ships for bulk cargo [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.04.1988
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip15.04.1988Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.06.1988 [1988/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Green, Claude Henri David
114 rue Michel-ange
F-75016 Paris / FR
[1987/15]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1987/15]
Representative(s)Robinson, John Stuart, et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1987/15]Robinson, John Stuart, et al
MARKS & CLERK, 57/60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date86306889.605.09.1986
[1987/15]
Priority number, dateGB1985002204105.09.1985         Original published format: GB 8522041
[1987/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0217561
Date:08.04.1987
Language:EN
[1987/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.02.1987
ClassificationIPC:B63B25/04
[1987/15]
CPC:
B63B25/04 (EP)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1987/26]
Former [1987/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  FR,  GB,  IT,  LI,  LU,  NL,  SE 
TitleGerman:Massnahmen zur Unterbringung von Massengütern auf Schiffen[1987/15]
English:Cargo-accommodating arrangements on ships for bulk cargo[1987/15]
French:Installations de chargement de navires pour marchandises en vrac[1987/15]
File destroyed:23.08.1994
Examination procedure08.12.1986Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
13.01.1987Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, LU
09.10.1987Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1988/22]
12.01.1988Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [1988/22]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
06.10.1986AT   M02   Not yet paid
06.10.1986CH   M02   Not yet paid
06.10.1986LU   M02   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
08.10.1987M02   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[YP]US4574721  ;
 [Y]US2469033
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.