EP0227212 - Automatic overflow control apparatus for a pipeline [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.1991 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.05.1991 [1991/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chuang, Rong-Chao No. 113, Nan-Yang Road Nan-Tsu Kaosiung / TW | [N/P] |
Former [1987/27] | For all designated states Chuang, Rong-Chao No. 113, Nan-Yang Road Nan-Tsu Kaosiung / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/27] | Representative(s) | Arthur, Bryan Edward, et al Withers & Rogers Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/27] | Arthur, Bryan Edward, et al Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 86306990.2 | 10.09.1986 | [1987/27] | Priority number, date | US19850775025 | 11.09.1985 Original published format: US 775025 | [1987/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0227212 | Date: | 01.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0227212 | Date: | 06.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | F16K1/14 | [1987/27] | CPC: |
F16K17/34 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7727 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7873 (EP,US);
Y10T137/791 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/27] | Title | German: | Automatischer Überschwemmungs-Kontrollapparat für eine Rohrleitung | [1987/27] | English: | Automatic overflow control apparatus for a pipeline | [1987/27] | French: | Appareil de contrôle automatique d'inondation pour une conduite de tuyaux | [1987/27] | Examination procedure | 30.09.1986 | Examination requested [1987/27] | 12.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.12.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US2942618 [ ] (HODGES JAMES W); | FR1371834 [ ] (VALLOUREC); | US3191277 [ ] (GLASGOW CLARENCE O); | DE2843152 [ ] (GINZLER PETER ING GRAD) |