EP0226273 - Improvements in or relating to rangefinders for imaging systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.05.1992 [1992/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Secretary of State for Defence in Her Britannic Majesty's Gov. of the United Kingdom of Great Britain and Northern Ireland Defence Evaluation & Research Agency Whitehall London SW1A 2HB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/26] | For all designated states The Secretary of State for Defence in Her Britannic Majesty's Government of the United Kingdom of Great Britain and Northern Ireland Whitehall London SW1A 2HB / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lettington, Alan Harold 86 Arundel Drive Worcester WR5 2HY / GB | [1987/26] | Representative(s) | Beckham, Robert William, et al D/IPR (DERA) Formalities Poplar 2 MoD Abbey Wood 19 Bristol BS34 8JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/26] | Beckham, Robert William, et al Defence Research Agency Intellectual Property Department DRA Farnborough Farnborough, Hants. GU14 6TD / GB | Application number, filing date | 86307061.1 | 12.09.1986 | [1987/26] | Priority number, date | GB19850023849 | 27.09.1985 Original published format: GB 8523849 | [1987/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0226273 | Date: | 24.06.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0226273 | Date: | 29.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H04N3/08, G01C3/08, G02B26/10 | [1987/26] | CPC: |
G02B26/129 (EP,US);
G01S7/4817 (EP,US);
G02B26/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/26] | Title | German: | Entfernungsmesser für Abbildungssysteme | [1987/26] | English: | Improvements in or relating to rangefinders for imaging systems | [1987/26] | French: | Télémètres pour systèmes d'images | [1987/26] | Examination procedure | 02.12.1987 | Examination requested [1988/05] | 25.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.12.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 13.10.1986 | DE   M02   Fee paid on   01.12.1986 | 13.10.1986 | FR   M02   Fee paid on   01.12.1986 | 13.10.1986 | GB   M02   Fee paid on   01.12.1986 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB1259148 [ ]; | US4084092 [ ] (RUNCIMAN HERBERT MORRISON); | DE3022365 [ ] (BARR & STROUD LTD [GB]); | DE3211046 [ ] (FERRANTI PLC [GB]); | US4457621 [ ] (HARRIS JEFFERY J [GB], et al); | US4542986 [ ] (BERDANIER BARRY N [US]) | by applicant | GB2110897 |