EP0218412 - Roof structure and fixture therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.1992 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.08.1992 [1992/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GANTAN BEAUTY INDUSTRY CO., LTD. 36-5, Shonandai 5-chome Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/45] | For all designated states GANTAN BEAUTY INDUSTRY CO., LTD. 36-5, Shonandai 5-chome Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | ||
Former [1987/16] | For all designated states Funaki, Motokatsu 430 Shimotsuchidana Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/16] | Representative(s) | Thomson, Paul Anthony, et al Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/16] | Thomson, Paul Anthony, et al Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside L41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 86307321.9 | 24.09.1986 | [1987/16] | Priority number, date | JP19850210958 | 26.09.1985 Original published format: JP 21095885 | JP19850210959 | 26.09.1985 Original published format: JP 21095985 | JP19850280999 | 16.12.1985 Original published format: JP 28099985 | [1987/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0218412 | Date: | 15.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0218412 | Date: | 15.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0218412 | Date: | 04.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | E04D3/362 | [1987/16] | CPC: |
E04D3/362 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1987/16] | Title | German: | Dachaufbau und Befestigungsmittel dafür | [1987/16] | English: | Roof structure and fixture therefor | [1987/16] | French: | Structure de toit et fixation | [1987/16] | Examination procedure | 11.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/24] | 05.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.03.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.06.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3945166 (HOSODA KIYOSHI, et al); | [A]EP0124707 (VAW VER ALUMINIUM WERKE AG [DE]); | [A]US3958387 (KANDABASHI SADAO); | [A]AU506471B (ZAMBELLI PTY LTD OTTO) |