EP0218477 - Rotors for A.C. synchronous motors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.12.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson Electric Industrial Manufactory Limited Johnson Building 14-16 Lee Chung Street Chaiwan / HK | [N/P] |
Former [1987/16] | For all designated states Johnson Electric Industrial Manufactory Limited Johnson Building 14-16 Lee Chung Street Chaiwan / HK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Srobl, Georg 19A South Bay Close Repulse Bay Hong Kong / CN | [1987/16] | Representative(s) | Higgins, Michael Roger, et al MARKS & CLERK 57/60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/16] | Higgins, Michael Roger, et al MARKS & CLERK 57/60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 86307625.3 | 02.10.1986 | [1987/16] | Priority number, date | GB19850024233 | 02.10.1985 Original published format: GB 8524233 | GB19860005385 | 05.03.1986 Original published format: GB 8605385 | [1987/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0218477 | Date: | 15.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0218477 | Date: | 27.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H02K1/28 | [1987/16] | CPC: |
H02K1/278 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1987/16] | Title | German: | Rotor für Wechselstrom-Synchronmotoren | [1987/16] | English: | Rotors for A.C. synchronous motors | [1987/16] | French: | Rotor pour moteurs synchronisés à courant alternatif | [1987/16] | File destroyed: | 24.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 18.05.1988 | Examination requested [1988/29] | 23.11.1989 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1990/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1989 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE664165 [ ] (HAECKEL GEB); | US2632123 [ ] (WILLIAM KOBER); | US3246187 [ ] (TOSHIO IEMURA); | US3246185 [ ] (HINTON RAY F); | GB2117188 [ ] (OKUMA MACHINERY WORKS LTD); | DD220182 [ ] (ELEKTROMASCH FORSCH ENTW [DD]) |