EP0263900 - Process for culturing methylophilus methylotrophus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.07.1988 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Celgene Corporation 7 Powderhorn Drive Warren New Jersey / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/16] | For all designated states CELGENE CORPORATION 7 Powderhorn Drive Warren New Jersey / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stirling, David I. 4, Lois Place Fanwood New Jersey / US | [1988/16] | Representative(s) | De Minvielle-Devaux, Ian Benedict Peter, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | [1988/16] | Application number, filing date | 86307689.9 | 06.10.1986 | [1988/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0263900 | Date: | 20.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/20, C12N1/32 | [1988/16] | CPC: |
C12N1/20 (EP);
C12N1/32 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1988/16] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Züchten von methylophilus methylotrophus | [1988/16] | English: | Process for culturing methylophilus methylotrophus | [1988/16] | French: | Procédé de culture de methylophilus methylotrophus | [1988/16] | File destroyed: | 23.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 27.07.1988 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1988/37] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]GB1370892 ; | [A]EP0127581 ; | [A]GB1525535 ; | [E]US4652527 | [A] - BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL, vol. 81, 1961pages 465-469; D.PEEL et al.: "Microbial growth on C1 compounds. 1. Isolation and characterization of Pseudomonas AM 1" |