EP0221681 - Clamping means for a strap [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.01.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electrolux Autoliv AB Luxbacken 1 Stockholm / SE | [1989/29] |
Former [1987/20] | For all designated states BRITAX (WINGARD) LIMITED Chandler Road Chichester West Sussex PO19 2UG / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cunningham, Douglas James 42 Viking Way Horndean Portsmouth Hampshire / GB | 02 /
McKernon, David Alan 28 White Horse Way Littlehampton West Sussex BN17 6NP / GB | [1987/20] | Representative(s) | Frankland, Nigel Howard, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/29] | Frankland, Nigel Howard, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | ||
Former [1987/20] | Hollinghurst, Antony B.S.G. International plc Patent Department Castle Trading Estate East Street Portchester, Hants PO16 9SD / GB | Application number, filing date | 86307698.0 | 06.10.1986 | [1987/20] | Priority number, date | GB19850024916 | 09.10.1985 Original published format: GB 8524916 | [1987/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0221681 | Date: | 13.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B60R22/42 | [1987/20] | CPC: |
B60R22/42 (EP,US);
B60R22/18 (KR);
B60R22/1855 (EP,US);
Y10T24/2175 (EP,US);
Y10T24/4016 (EP,US);
Y10T24/4072 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [1987/20] | Title | German: | Gurtsperrvorrichtung | [1987/20] | English: | Clamping means for a strap | [1987/20] | French: | Dispositif de blocage pour une sangle | [1987/20] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 11.09.1987 | Examination requested [1987/45] | 10.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1990/11] | 24.10.1989 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1990/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1097178 (VOLVO AB); | [A]EP0061825 (BRITAX WINGARD LTD [GB]); | [AD]EP0147059 (BRITAX WINGARD LTD [GB]) |