EP0228780 - Grommet assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.07.1987 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION General Motors Building 3044 West Grand Boulevard Detroit Michigan 48202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/29] | For all designated states GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION General Motors Building 3044 West Grand Boulevard Detroit Michigan 48202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sovacool, David Kevin 224 North Colonial Drive Cortland Ohio 44410 / US | 02 /
Van Slyke, Allan Seaburn 3931 County Line Road Southington Ohio 44470 / US | 03 /
Bungo, Edward Martin 379 Cherry Hill Lane Courtland Ohio 44410 / US | [1987/29] | Representative(s) | Breakwell, John Neil Bower, et al GM Patent Section Vauxhall Motors Limited Luton Office (F6) P.O. Box No. 3 Kimpton Road Luton Bedfordshire LU2 OSY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/29] | Breakwell, John Neil Bower, et al GM Patent Section Vauxhall Motors Limited Luton Office (F6) P.O. Box No. 3 Kimpton Road Luton Bedfordshire LU2 OSY / GB | Application number, filing date | 86308102.2 | 20.10.1986 | [1987/29] | Priority number, date | US19850796198 | 08.11.1985 Original published format: US 796198 | [1987/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0228780 | Date: | 15.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/29] | Classification | IPC: | H01B17/58 | [1987/29] | CPC: |
F16L5/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1987/29] | Title | German: | Zusammengesetzte Buchse | [1987/29] | English: | Grommet assembly | [1987/29] | French: | Manchon composite | [1987/29] | File destroyed: | 02.07.1993 | Examination procedure | 31.10.1986 | Examination requested [1987/29] | 14.07.1987 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1987/37] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |