EP0227271 - Limiting the presence of the oxides of nitrogen in regenerative heating systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.1991 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.09.1991 [1991/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states British Gas plc Rivermill House, 152 Grosvenor Road London SW1V 3JL / GB | For all designated states Hotwork Developments Ltd Little Royd Mill Low Road Earlsheaton Dewsbury West Yorkshire / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/27] | For all designated states British Gas plc Rivermill House 152 Grosvenor Road London SW1V 3JL / GB | ||
For all designated states Hotwork Developments Ltd Little Royd Mill Low Road Earlsheaton Dewsbury West Yorkshire / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goodfellow, James Herbert 552 Leeds Road Dewsbury West Yorkshire / GB | [1987/27] | Representative(s) | Morgan, David James British Gas plc Intellectual Property Department 59 Bryanston Street London W1A 2AZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/27] | Morgan, David James British Gas plc, Intellectual Property Department, 59 Bryanston Street London W1A 2AZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 86308607.0 | 05.11.1986 | [1987/27] | Priority number, date | GB19850031277 | 19.12.1985 Original published format: GB 8531277 | GB19860004168 | 20.02.1986 Original published format: GB 8604168 | [1987/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0227271 | Date: | 01.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0227271 | Date: | 21.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0227271 | Date: | 12.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F23L15/02, F23L7/00 | [1987/27] | CPC: |
F23L7/002 (EP,US);
F23L15/02 (EP,US);
Y02E20/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, IT, NL [1987/27] | Title | German: | Begrenzung der Anwesenheit von Oxiden von Stickstoff in regenerativen Wärmesystemen | [1987/27] | English: | Limiting the presence of the oxides of nitrogen in regenerative heating systems | [1987/27] | French: | Limitation de la présence d'oxydes d'azote dans des systèmes de régénération de chaleur | [1987/27] | Examination procedure | 16.06.1987 | Examination requested [1987/34] | 28.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 12.03.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 15.03.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1054556 ; | [A]GB244906 (WILLIAM THEOPHLIUS CHAMBERLAIN) | Examination | GB2128724 |