EP0223503 - A control circuit for a heating unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.1993 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.05.1993 [1993/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THORN EMI Patents Limited Blyth Road Hayes Middlesex UB3 1BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/49] | For all designated states THORN EMI Patents Limited Blyth Road Hayes Middlesex UB3 1BP / GB | ||
Former [1987/22] | For all designated states THORN EMI Appliances Limited THORN EMI House Upper Saint Martin's Lane London, WC2H 9ED / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Newton, Stephen John 7, Dodsley Gardens Easebourne Midhurst West Sussex, GU21 9DE / GB | 02 /
Wellcome, David "Millway" West Ashling Chichester Sussex / GB | [1987/22] | Representative(s) | Hurst, Richard Arthur Alexander, et al THORN EMI Patents Limited Central Research Laboratories Dawley Road Hayes, Middlesex UB3 1HH / GB | [1990/01] |
Former [1987/22] | Marsh, Robin Geoffrey THORN EMI Patents Limited Central Research Laboratories Dawley Road Hayes, Middlesex UB3 1HH / GB | Application number, filing date | 86308615.3 | 05.11.1986 | [1987/22] | Priority number, date | GB19850027683 | 09.11.1985 Original published format: GB 8527683 | [1987/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0223503 | Date: | 27.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0223503 | Date: | 13.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H05B3/74, F24C15/10 | [1987/22] | CPC: |
H05B3/744 (EP);
F24C15/106 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/22] | Title | German: | Steuerungsschaltung für eine Heizeinheit | [1987/22] | English: | A control circuit for a heating unit | [1987/22] | French: | Circuit de commande pour une unité de chauffage | [1987/22] | Examination procedure | 16.09.1987 | Examination requested [1987/46] | 10.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.11.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2060329 (THORN DOMESTIC APPLIANCES LTD); | [A]GB2114829 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE); | [A]US4443690 (PAYNE THOMAS R [US], et al); | [A]DE3334425 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]); | [XP]EP0174774 (THORN EMI APPLIANCES [GB]); | [XP]GB2170665 (THORN EMI DOMESTIC APPLIANCES) | Examination | GB2132060 |