EP0228810 - Enzyme immunoassay method for epidermal growth factor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.07.1991 [1991/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIHON CHEMICAL RESEARCH KABUSHIKI KAISHA also known as JAPAN CHEMICAL RESEARCH CO., LTD 4-20, Mikagehommachi 3-chome Higashinada-ku Kobe Hyogo 658 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/29] | For all designated states NIHON CHEMICAL RESEARCH KABUSHIKI KAISHA also known as JAPAN CHEMICAL RESEARCH CO., LTD 4-20, Mikagehommachi 3-chome Higashinada-ku Kobe Hyogo 658 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hayashi, Kyozo 206 Howaito Kopo Fukagai 828-1, Iwasaki Gifu Gifu 502 / JP | 02 /
Kurobe, Masayuki 5-16, Kamitsuchii 2-chome Gifu Gifu 502 / JP | 03 /
Nishimuro, Satoshi 10-107, Uzumoridai 2-chome Higashinada-ku Kobe Hyogo 658 / JP | 04 /
Hiratani, Hajime 705-3, Tottori Hannan-cho Sennan-gun Osaka 599-02 / JP | [1987/29] | Representative(s) | Burford, Anthony Frederick, et al Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/29] | Burford, Anthony Frederick, et al W.H. Beck, Greener & Co. 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 86309181.5 | 25.11.1986 | [1987/29] | Priority number, date | JP19850265822 | 25.11.1985 Original published format: JP 26582285 | [1987/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0228810 | Date: | 15.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0228810 | Date: | 11.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/74, G01N33/577, G01N33/535 | [1987/29] | CPC: |
G01N33/74 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1987/29] | Title | German: | Enzymimmunoassaymethode für den Hautwachstumsfaktor | [1987/29] | English: | Enzyme immunoassay method for epidermal growth factor | [1987/29] | French: | Méthode d'immuno-essai enzymatique pour le facteur de croissance épidermique | [1987/29] | Examination procedure | 26.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/04] | 13.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 103, no. 7, August 19, 1985, Columbus, Ohio, USA HAYASHI et al. "A sensitive twosite enzyme immunoassay for human epidermal growth factor (urogastrone) page 59, column 2, abstract no. 48 309e | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 90, no. 19, May 7, 1979, Columbus, Ohio, USA R.L.LADDA et al. "radioreceptor assay for epidermal growth factor" page 260, column 2, abstract no. 148 024q | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 88, no. 9, February 27, 1978, Columbus, Ohio, USA R.H.STARKEY et al. "Radioimmunoassay of human epidermal growth factor" page 174, column 1, abstract no. 59 868j | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 89, no. 7, August 14, 1978, Columbus, Ohio, USA G.E.DAILEY et al. "Homologous radioimmunoassay for human epidermal growth factor (urogastrone)" page 258, column 1, abstract no. 55 933z | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 91, no. 9, August 27, 1979, Columbus, Ohio, USA H.GREGORY et al. "Urogastrone-epidermal growth factor" page 289, column 2, abstract no. 71 082t |