EP0226375 - Extruded quick-cooking rice-like product [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.07.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL FOODS CORPORATION 250 North Street White Plains, N.Y. 10625 / US | [1987/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scelia, Richard P. 27, High Acres Drive Thornwood New York, 10594 / US | 02 /
Hegedus, Elizabeth 347, Martling Avenue Tarrytown New York, 10591 / US | 03 /
Giacone, Joseph 10, Columbia Place Princeton Junction New Jersey 08550 / US | 04 /
Bruins, Henderikus B. RR1 Box 153B Cream Ridge New Jersey 08514 / US | 05 /
Benjamin, Earl J. 150, Beechmont Drive New Rochelle NewYork 10804 / US | [1987/26] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/26] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86309348.0 | 01.12.1986 | [1987/26] | Priority number, date | US19850803189 | 02.12.1985 Original published format: US 803189 | [1987/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0226375 | Date: | 24.06.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/182, A23L1/168 | [1987/26] | CPC: |
A23L7/17 (EP,KR);
A23L7/143 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, SE [1987/26] | Title | German: | Extrudiertes schnell kochendes reisähnliches Produkt | [1987/26] | English: | Extruded quick-cooking rice-like product | [1987/26] | French: | Procuit extrudé semblable au riz, à cuisson rapide | [1987/26] | File destroyed: | 24.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 23.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/04] | 18.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/35] | 06.04.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1989/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4521436 (LOU WEN C [US], et al); | [AD]US4325976 (HARROW ALASTAIR D, et al); | [A]CA1028194 (GEN FOODS LTD) |