EP0227356 - The use of depogen in the treatment of restricted blood circulation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.06.1996 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.08.1996 [1996/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHINOIN Gyogyszer és Vegyészeti Termékek Gyára RT. To utca 1-5 H-1045 Budapest IV / HU | [N/P] |
Former [1987/27] | For all designated states CHINOIN Gyogyszer és Vegyészeti Termékek Gyára RT. To utca 1-5 H-1045 Budapest IV / HU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Szentmiklosi, Peter 75 Rudas L u H-1064 Budapest / HU | 02 /
Hermecz, Istvan 53 Molnar u H-1056 Budapest / HU | 03 /
Meszaros, Zoltan 6 Csetneki u H-1113 Budapest / HU | 04 /
Tardos, Laszlo 34 Egri J u H-1111 Budapest / HU | 05 /
Marton, Jeno 19 Szel u H-1035 Budapest / HU | 06 /
Vasvari, Lelle 33 Goldmark K u H-1122 Budapest / HU | 07 /
Horvarth, Agnes 30/a Budenz u H-1021 Budapest / HU | 08 /
Marmarosi, Katalin 19 Ybl s H-2051 Biatorbagy / HU | [1987/27] | Representative(s) | Skailes, Humphrey John, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/27] | Skailes, Humphrey John, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 86309456.1 | 04.12.1986 | [1987/27] | Priority number, date | HU19850004639 | 04.12.1985 Original published format: HU 463985 | [1987/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0227356 | Date: | 01.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0227356 | Date: | 13.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0227356 | Date: | 16.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/485, A61K31/52 | [1987/27] | CPC: |
A61K31/52 (EP,US);
A61K31/485 (EP,US);
A61P9/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/27] | Title | German: | Verwendung von Depogen zur Behandlung von eingeschränktem Blutkreislauf | [1987/27] | English: | The use of depogen in the treatment of restricted blood circulation | [1987/27] | French: | Utilisation de dépogène pour le traitement de la circulation réduite du sang | [1987/27] | Examination procedure | 02.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/18] | 13.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR4135M [ ]; | GB1129134 [ ] (STERLING WINTHROP GROUP LTD); | DE1492203 [ ] (THOMAE GMBH DR K); | FR2202686 [ ] (FABRE SA PIERRE [FR]); | GB1417323 [ ] (HOECHST AG); | FR2279394 [ ] (SAUNIER LABORATOIRES [FR]); | US4364922 [ ] (BERNE ROBERT M, et al); | US4383997 [ ] (BOUCHER JOHN H [US]) | [ ] - Ther. Hung., Vol. 15, No. 4, pages 147-150, 1967, Budapest, HU, F. SOLTI et al.: "The effect of No-Spa on peripheral circulation", Results; Discussion. | [ ] - J.E.F. REYNOLDS (Ed.), Martindale, The Extra Pharmacopoeia, 28th edition, 1982, pages 341-349,1059, The Pharmaceutical Press, London, GB, whole document. | [ ] - Wien-Zeit. Inn. Med., Vol. 53, No. 10, 1972, pages 539-543, Wien, AT, P. BAUMGARTL et al.: "Kreislaufwirkungen von Drotaverin bei Gesunden mit und ohne Isoproterenol-stimulation", page 539: "Diskussion". | [ ] - Acta Pharmaceutica Hungarica, Vol. 49, 1979, pages 50-53, Budapest, HU, P. SZENTMIKLOSI et al.: "Pratical significance of drug-equivalence in preclinical research", Abstract. |