EP0236627 - Duplex microphone communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.11.1989 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUDIO-TECHNICA U.S., INC. 1221 Commerce Drive Stow Ohio 44224 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/38] | For all designated states AUDIO-TECHNICA U.S., INC. 1221 Commerce Drive Stow Ohio 44224 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reichel, Kenneth R. 460 North Main Street Hudson Ohio 44236 / US | 02 /
Hebrock, Steve 642 Shook Road Akron Ohio 44319 / US | [1987/38] | Representative(s) | Newstead, Michael John, et al Page Hargrave Southgate Whitefriars Lewins Mead Bristol BS1 2NT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/38] | Newstead, Michael John, et al Page Hargrave Temple Gate House Temple Gate Bristol BS1 6PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 86309545.1 | 08.12.1986 | [1987/38] | Priority number, date | US19860838587 | 11.03.1986 Original published format: US 838587 | [1987/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0236627 | Date: | 16.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0236627 | Date: | 03.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H04B3/00 | [1987/38] | CPC: |
H04B3/00 (EP,US);
H04B3/20 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1987/38] | Title | German: | Duplex-Mikrophonübertragungssystem | [1987/38] | English: | Duplex microphone communication system | [1987/38] | French: | Système de communication duplex à microphone | [1987/38] | File destroyed: | 26.05.1995 | Examination procedure | 03.07.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/52] | 01.08.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1989/52] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.1989 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1096523 (ELECTRONIQUE & AUTOMATISME SA); | [A]US4173714 (BLOCH ALAN [US], et al); | [X]JPS5222806 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 1, no. 86 (E-77)[1972], 11th August 1977page 1972 E 77; & JP-A-52 22 806 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 21-02-1977 |