EP0226433 - High density printed wiring board [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.02.1991 [1991/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/26] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seyama, Kiyotaka Fujitsu Ltd Patent Department Kosugi Fujitsu Bldg 1812-10 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [1987/26] | Representative(s) | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/26] | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 86309571.7 | 09.12.1986 | [1987/26] | Priority number, date | JP19850277580 | 09.12.1985 Original published format: JP 27758085 | [1987/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0226433 | Date: | 24.06.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0226433 | Date: | 02.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0226433 | Date: | 07.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H05K1/00, H05K1/11, H01L23/52 | [1987/26] | CPC: |
H05K1/0292 (EP,US);
H01L23/5384 (EP,US);
H05K1/114 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16225 (EP,US);
H05K1/0298 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10704 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10719 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10734 (EP,US);
H05K3/429 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49156 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB [1987/26] | Title | German: | Gedruckte Schaltungsplatte mit hoher Dichte | [1987/26] | English: | High density printed wiring board | [1987/26] | French: | Circuit imprimé à haute densité | [1987/26] | Examination procedure | 13.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/11] | 15.06.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.10.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.06.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.12.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4521449 (ARNOLD ANTHONY F [US], et al); | [A]US4016463 (BEALL ROBERT J, et al) | [X] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 27, no. 2, July 1984, pages 1201,1202, New York, US; R.A. MAGEE et al.: "Pinned multilayer ceramic substrate" | [Y] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 21, no. 11, April 1979, pages 4491,4492, New York, US; M.R. MARASCH et al.:"Dual-purpose bonding pads for semiconductor package substrates" | [A] - ELEKTRONIK, vol. 29, no. 21, Oktober 1980, pages 125-128, Munich, DE; H. KRUMM: "Bessere Leiterplattenausnutzung mit neuem Mehrchip-IC-Gehäuse" |