EP0228210 - Filter unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.1990 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.02.1991 [1991/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FILTERWERK MANN + HUMMEL GMBH Postfach 4 09 D-71631 Ludwigsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/44] | For all designated states FILTERWERK MANN & HUMMEL GMBH Postfach 4 09 D-71631 Ludwigsburg / DE | ||
Former [1987/28] | For all designated states AMSTED Industries Incorporated 3700 Prudential Plaza Chicago, IL. 60601 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wykoff, Richard H. 35221 Vargo Livonia Michigan 48154 / US | [1987/28] | Representative(s) | Boyes, Kenneth Aubrey, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/05] | Boyes, Kenneth Aubrey, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | ||
Former [1989/44] | Wehnert, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Graalfs, Dipl.-Ing. Hauck, Dipl.-Ing. Wehnert, Dr.-Ing. Döring Mozartstrasse 23 D-80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1987/28] | Boyes, Kenneth Aubrey Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 86309577.4 | 09.12.1986 | [1987/28] | Priority number, date | US19850806484 | 09.12.1985 Original published format: US 806484 | [1987/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0228210 | Date: | 08.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0228210 | Date: | 07.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B01D33/04 | [1987/28] | CPC: |
B01D29/606 (EP,US);
B01D29/096 (EP,US);
B01D29/6469 (EP,US);
B01D29/68 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1987/28] | Title | German: | Filteranlage | [1987/28] | English: | Filter unit | [1987/28] | French: | Dispositif de filtration | [1987/28] | Examination procedure | 06.10.1987 | Examination requested [1987/49] | 12.10.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.03.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.12.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2885080 (WILLIAM GOLDMAN MYRON); | [A]FR1235090 ; | [AD]US3087620 (GENE HIRS); | [AD]US3091336 (GENE HIRS); | [A]FR1337749 ; | [A]US3221885 (GENE HIRS); | [A]US3288296 (GENE HIRS); | [X]US4242205 (HIRS GENE [US]) |