EP0227375 - Polyolefin fiber roll and method of making the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.02.1993 [1993/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/27] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lux, Ronald E. c/o Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company 2501 Hudson Road P.O. Box 33427 St.Paul Minn. 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
Miller, Eugene J. c/o Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company 2501 Hudson Road P.O. Box 33427 St.Paul Minn. 55133-3427 / US | [1987/27] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/27] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86309581.6 | 09.12.1986 | [1987/27] | Priority number, date | US19850808111 | 12.12.1985 Original published format: US 808111 | [1987/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0227375 | Date: | 01.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0227375 | Date: | 08.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0227375 | Date: | 26.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B29D31/00, B08B1/04, B21B39/00 | [1989/07] | CPC: |
B29D99/0035 (EP,US);
B21B27/02 (KR);
F16C13/00 (EP,US);
B29L2031/324 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49554 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1987/27] | B29D31/00, B08B1/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [1987/27] | Title | German: | Walze aus Polyolefinfasern und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [1987/27] | English: | Polyolefin fiber roll and method of making the same | [1987/27] | French: | Rouleau en fibres de polyoléfine et sa méthode de fabrication | [1987/27] | Examination procedure | 11.05.1989 | Examination requested [1989/29] | 27.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.08.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.11.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US3853677 (KAI M); | [A]FR2272005 (FREUDENBERG CARL [DE]); | [Y]FR2401080 (ICHIKAWA WOOLEN TEXTILE [JP]) |