EP0235456 - Image processing apparatus and method with blocks of compressed data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1987/37] | Image processing apparatus | ||
[1998/37] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/37] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sato, Mamoru 10-14 Himonya 4-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Osawa, Hidefumi 5-11 Kamikizaki 4-chome Urawa-shi Saitama-ken / JP | 03 /
Kawamura, Naoto 2-16-102 Azamino 3-chome Midori-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1987/37] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/37] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 86309702.8 | 12.12.1986 | [1987/37] | Priority number, date | JP19850281631 | 13.12.1985 Original published format: JP 28163185 | JP19850281632 | 13.12.1985 Original published format: JP 28163285 | JP19850281633 | 13.12.1985 Original published format: JP 28163385 | JP19850281634 | 13.12.1985 Original published format: JP 28163485 | JP19850281537 | 14.12.1985 Original published format: JP 28153785 | [1987/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0235456 | Date: | 09.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0235456 | Date: | 24.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0235456 | Date: | 24.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G06T9/00, G06T11/00 | [1998/37] | CPC: |
G06T1/20 (EP,US);
G06T11/00 (EP,US);
G06T9/00 (EP,US);
G06T9/001 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/18] | G06F15/62, G06F15/64 | ||
Former IPC [1987/37] | G06F15/62 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1987/37] | Title | German: | Bildverarbeitungsgerät und -verfahren mit Blöcken von komprimierten Daten | [1999/03] | English: | Image processing apparatus and method with blocks of compressed data | [1998/37] | French: | Appareil et méthode de traitement d'image utilisant des blocs de données comprimées | [1999/03] |
Former [1987/37] | Bildverarbeitungsgerät | ||
Former [1987/37] | Image processing apparatus | ||
Former [1987/37] | Appareil de traitement d'image | Miscellaneous | EPB 1994/10: Teilanmeldung 93203482.0 eingereicht am 12/12/86 | EPB 1994/10: Divisional application 93203482.0 filed on 12/12/86 | EPB 1994/10: Demande divisionnaire 93203482.0 déposée le 12/12/86 | Examination procedure | 08.05.1989 | New documents discovered [1989/26] | 14.10.1989 | Examination requested [1989/50] | 14.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 27.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.1995 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.03.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 03.03.1995 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 10.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.07.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 02.05.1995 | Appeal received No. T0650/95 | 05.10.1994 | Interlocutory revision of appeal | 13.07.1995 | Statement of grounds filed | 10.02.1998 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | 31.08.1994 | Appeal received No. T0650/95 | 31.08.1994 | Statement of grounds filed | 11.02.1997 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M08) [1997/07] | 13.10.1997 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1997/42] | 10.02.1998 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | Divisional application(s) | EP93203481.2 / EP0597555 | EP93203482.0 / EP0597556 | Opposition(s) | 28.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 18.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 24.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1551229 (UNIV MANCHESTER); | [A]GB2073998 (VYSOKA SKOLA CHEM TECH); | [A]GB2024561 (TEKNOS SYSTEMS LTD) | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SYSTEMS, MAN, AND CYBERNETICS, July 1973, pages 410-415, New York, US; K.S. HAN et al.: "The application of an image-compression/feature-transgeneration technique to the computer-aided diagnosis of brain tumors" | Examination | GB2073995 | EP0179292 | US4636783 | US4281312 | US3945019 | by applicant | EP0179292 | US4636783 | US4281312 |