EP0228223 - Non-irritating suprofen solution [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.1988 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CILAG AG 24 Industriestrasse CH-6300 Zug / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1987/28] | For all designated states Cilag AG 24 Industriestrasse CH-6300 Zug / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boller, Fritz Henri Soligänterstrasse 41 CH-8189 Bülach / CH | 02 /
Niederer, Roland Rudolph Im Landgut CH-8211 Stetten / CH | [1987/28] | Representative(s) | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/28] | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 86309753.1 | 15.12.1986 | [1987/28] | Priority number, date | US19850809676 | 16.12.1985 Original published format: US 809676 | [1987/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0228223 | Date: | 08.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0228223 | Date: | 09.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/38, A61K47/00 | [1987/28] | CPC: |
A61K31/38 (EP);
A61K47/44 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/28] | Title | German: | Nichtirritierende Suprofenlösungen | [1987/28] | English: | Non-irritating suprofen solution | [1987/28] | French: | Solution non irritante à base de suprofène | [1987/28] | File destroyed: | 23.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 10.05.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/44] | 06.06.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1988/44] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0072462 (TOKO YAKUHIN KOGYO KK [JP]); | [A]EP0093563 (KOWA CO [JP]); | [Y]FR2440189 (UNILEVER NV [NL]); | [AD]US4423030 (HAYES HARRY [GB], et al) |