EP0227410 - Peptide derivatives, their production and use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.04.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takeda Chemical Industries, Ltd. 1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka / JP | [1992/40] |
Former [1989/46] | For all designated states TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-fu / JP | ||
Former [1987/27] | For all designated states Takeda Chemical Industries, Ltd. 1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goto, Giichi 6-11, Kofudai 5-chome Toyono-cho Toyono-gun Õsaka 563-01 / JP | 02 /
Nagaoka, Akinobu 45-8, Daiwahigashi 1-chome Kawanishi Hyogo 666-01 / JP | 03 /
Wakimasu, Mitsuhiro B-510, 17 Yamatecho 3-chome Suita Osaka 564 / JP | [2007/32] |
Former [1987/27] | 01 /
Goto, Giichi 6-11, Kofudai 5-chome Toyono-cho Toyono-gun Osaka 563-01 / JP | ||
02 /
Nagaoka, Akinobu 45-8, Daiwahigashi 1-chome Kawanishi Hyogo 666-01 / JP | |||
03 /
Wakimasu, Mitsuhiro B-510, 17 Yamatecho 3-chome Suita Osaka 564 / JP | Representative(s) | Lewin, John Harvey, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/27] | Lewin, John Harvey, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 86309800.0 | 16.12.1986 | [1987/27] | Priority number, date | JP19850291474 | 24.12.1985 Original published format: JP 29147485 | [1987/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0227410 | Date: | 01.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0227410 | Date: | 08.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/06, A61K37/02, C07K7/16 | [1989/03] | CPC: |
C07K7/16 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
Y02P20/55 (EP,US);
Y10S930/26 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1987/27] | C07K7/06, A61K37/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/27] | Title | German: | Peptid-Derivate, deren Herstellung und Verwendung | [1987/27] | English: | Peptide derivatives, their production and use | [1987/27] | French: | Dérivés peptidiques, leur production et leur emploi | [1987/27] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 16.05.1989 | Examination requested [1989/29] | 18.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.01.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1993/24] | 02.02.1993 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1993/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1992 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0106404 (AKZO NV [NL]) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 100, 1984, page 91, no. 18074v, Columbus, Ohio, US; J.P.H.URBACH et al.: "Oxytocin is a precursor of potent behaviorally active neuropeptides" & EUR. J. PHARMACOL. 1983, 94(1-2), 125-31 | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 80, 1974, pages 176-177, no. 129802u, Columbus, Ohio, US; B.M.FERRIER et al.: "Plasma oxytocinase. Synthesis and biological properties of the first product of the degradation of oxytocin by this enzyme" & CAN. J. BIOCHEM. 1974, 52(1), 60-6 | [YP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 101, 1984, page 680, no. 73088y, Columbus, Ohio, US; J.W.VAN NISPEN et al.: "Synthesis and behavioral activity of fragments of oxytocin and arginine vasopressin containing a cystine residue in position 6" & PEPT.: STRUCT. FUNCT., PROC. AM. PEPT. SYMP., 8th 1983, 421-4 | [YP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 106, 1987, page 80, no. 113792k, Columbus, Ohio, US; O.J.W.GAFFORI et al.: "Time-related memory effects of vasopressin analogs in rats" & PHARMACOL., BIOCHEM. BEHAV. 1986, 25(6), 1125-9 | [YP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 105, 1986, page 117, no. 18853b, Columbus, Ohio, US; G.L.KOVACS et al.: "Facilitation of avoidance behavior by vasopressin fragments microinjected into limbic-midbrain structures" & BRAIN RES. 1986, 371(1), 17-24 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 104, 1986, page 94, no. 1071b, Columbus, Ohio, US; G.L.KOVACS et al.: "Behaviorally active oxytocin fragments simultaneously attenuate heroin self-administration and tolerance in rats" & LIFE SCI 1985, 37(20), 1895-900 |