EP0227451 - 5,6-Dialkoxy-4-imino-2 (1H)quinazolinone derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.01.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ORTHO PHARMACEUTICAL CORPORATION U.S. Route 202 P.O. Box 300 Raritan New Jersey 08869-0602 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/27] | For all designated states ORTHO PHARMACEUTICAL CORPORATION U.S. Route 202 P.O. Box 300 Raritan New Jersey 08869-0602 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bandurco, Victor T. 204 Love Road Bridge Water NJ 08807 / US | 02 /
Falotico, Robert 40 Black Horse Run Belle Mead NJ 08502 / US | 03 /
Bell, Stanley C. 732 Braeburn Lane Narberth PA 19072 / US | 04 /
Schwender, Charles Box 697C Philhower Road RR 1 Califon NJ 07830 / US | 05 /
Tobia, Alfonso J. 43 Foxcroft Drive Doylestown PA 18901 / US | [1987/27] | Representative(s) | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/27] | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 86309958.6 | 19.12.1986 | [1987/27] | Priority number, date | US19850811238 | 20.12.1985 Original published format: US 811238 | [1987/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0227451 | Date: | 01.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0227451 | Date: | 13.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07D239/95, A61K31/505, C07C127/19 | [1987/27] | CPC: |
C07D239/95 (EP,US);
A61P9/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/27] | Title | German: | 5,6-Dialkoxy-4-imino-2(1H)chinazolinon-Derivate | [1987/27] | English: | 5,6-Dialkoxy-4-imino-2 (1H)quinazolinone derivatives | [1987/27] | French: | Dérivés de 5,6-dialkoxy-4-imino-2(1H)quinazolinones | [1987/27] | File destroyed: | 24.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 16.06.1988 | Examination requested [1988/33] | 21.01.1989 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1989/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0183348 (ORTHO PHARMA CORP [US]); | [A]EP0028473 (PFIZER [US]); | [A]CH507917 (AGRIPAT SA [CH]) |