EP0229536 - Ground effect air cushion vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.08.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.09.1989 [1989/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chaneac, André 07200 Aubenas (Ardeche) / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/30] | For all designated states Chaneac, André F-07200 Aubenas (Ardeche) / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/30] | Representative(s) | Cabinet HERRBURGER 67 avenue Niel 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/30] | Cabinet Pierre HERRBURGER 115, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 86400035.1 | 09.01.1986 | [1987/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0229536 | Date: | 22.07.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B60V1/08, B60V1/22 | [1987/30] | CPC: |
B60V1/22 (EP);
B60V1/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1987/30] | Title | German: | Luftkissen- und Bodeneffektfahrzeug | [1987/30] | English: | Ground effect air cushion vehicle | [1987/30] | French: | Véhicule à coussin d'air et à effet de sol | [1987/30] | File destroyed: | 24.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 14.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/11] | 19.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/38] | 19.04.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1989/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.02.1988 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   05.05.1988 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0125987 ; | [Y]FR2061519 ; | [A]US3322223 ; | [A]DE2054536 ; | [A]US3077321 ; | [A]FR1333727 ; | [A]US3126169 ; | [A]US4151893 ; | [A]US3177545 ; | [A]GB1170747 |