EP0190968 - Flexible wheel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1986/33] | Reshapable wheel | ||
[1991/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Le Feron de Longcamp, Guy 9, Rue Massenet F-75116 Paris / FR | [1986/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/33] | Application number, filing date | 86400155.7 | 27.01.1986 | [1986/33] | Priority number, date | FR19850001420 | 01.02.1985 Original published format: FR 8501420 | [1986/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0190968 | Date: | 13.08.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0190968 | Date: | 23.10.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B60B9/26, B60B19/00 | [1986/33] | CPC: |
B60B3/02 (EP);
B60B19/00 (EP);
B60B9/02 (EP);
B60B9/20 (EP);
B60B2310/305 (EP);
B60B2310/318 (EP);
B60B2310/321 (EP);
B60B2310/56 (EP);
B60B2360/102 (EP);
B60B2360/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/33] | Title | German: | Deformierbares Rad | [1986/33] | English: | Flexible wheel | [1991/43] | French: | Roue déformable | [1986/33] |
Former [1986/33] | Reshapable wheel | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 10.04.1987 | Examination requested [1987/36] | 29.07.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 20.01.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 01.02.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 13.02.1987 | M02   Fee paid on   10.04.1987 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.02.1988 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   02.06.1988 | 31.01.1989 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   24.03.1989 | 31.01.1991 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   21.05.1991 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.10.1991 | IT | 23.10.1991 | NL | 23.10.1991 | BE | 31.01.1992 | CH | 31.01.1992 | LI | 31.01.1992 | [1999/42] |
Former [1997/17] | AT | 23.10.1991 | |
NL | 23.10.1991 | ||
BE | 31.01.1992 | ||
CH | 31.01.1992 | ||
LI | 31.01.1992 | ||
Former [1993/01] | AT | 23.10.1991 | |
NL | 23.10.1991 | ||
BE | 31.01.1992 | ||
CH | 31.01.1992 | ||
LI | 31.01.1992 | ||
Former [1992/49] | AT | 23.10.1991 | |
NL | 23.10.1991 | ||
CH | 31.01.1992 | ||
LI | 31.01.1992 | ||
Former [1992/29] | AT | 23.10.1991 | |
NL | 23.10.1991 | ||
Former [1992/26] | NL | 23.10.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE297656 ; | [A]US3620278 (MARKOW EDWARD G); | [A]DE2144353 (KAUTSCHUK KUNSTSTOFF GMBH); | [A]FR2339505 (DUNLOP LTD [GB]); | [AD]EP0023460 (FERON DE LONGCAMP LE); | [A]FR2502070 (SCHNUETTGEN ALFRED [DE]) |