blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0192561

EP0192561 - Sliding part comprising a bolt cooperating with a seat belt buckle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.04.1991
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip13.04.1991No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.06.1991 [1991/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ECIA - EQUIPEMENTS ET COMPOSANTS POUR L'INDUSTRIE AUTOMOBILE
F-25400 Audincourt / FR
[N/P]
Former [1990/02]For all designated states
ECIA - EQUIPEMENTS ET COMPOSANTS POUR L'INDUSTRIE AUTOMOBILE
F-25400 Audincourt / FR
Former [1988/35]For all designated states
ECIA - EQUIPEMENTS ET COMPOSANTS POUR L'INDUSTRIE AUTOMOBILE
F-25400 Audincourt (Doubs) / FR
Former [1986/35]For all designated states
ACIERS ET OUTILLAGE PEUGEOT Société dite:
F-25400 Audincourt (Doubs) / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Monsigny, Jean
30 rue Zornhoff
F-67700 Saverne / FR
[1986/35]
Representative(s)Moncheny, Michel, et al
Cabinet Lavoix
2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [1986/35]Moncheny, Michel, et al
c/o Cabinet Lavoix 2 Place d'Estienne d'Orves
F-75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date86400294.411.02.1986
[1986/35]
Priority number, dateFR1985000223215.02.1985         Original published format: FR 8502232
[1986/35]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0192561
Date:27.08.1986
Language:FR
[1986/35]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0192561
Date:23.03.1988
Language:FR
[1988/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0192561
Date:13.06.1990
Language:FR
[1990/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.02.1988
ClassificationIPC:B60R22/06
[1986/35]
CPC:
B60R22/06 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   IT,   SE [1986/35]
TitleGerman:Gleitteil mit einem Riegel, der mit einer Sicherheitsgurtschnalle zusammenwirkt[1986/35]
English:Sliding part comprising a bolt cooperating with a seat belt buckle[1986/35]
French:Organe coulissant comportant un pène coopérant avec une boucle solidaire d'une ceinture de sécurité[1986/35]
Examination procedure20.02.1988Examination requested  [1988/16]
09.12.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.12.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.11.1989Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
11.12.1989Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
18.12.1989Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.03.1990Fee for grant paid
07.03.1990Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.03.1991No opposition filed within time limit [1991/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.02.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
15.02.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
09.02.1990Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]DE3105480  ;
 [AD]DE3019158  ;
 [AD]DE3302163
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.