EP0194180 - Process for the solventless production of pyrotechnical products having a thermosetting binder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1986/37] | Process for the solventless production of pyrotechnical products having a thermosetting binder, and products made by this process, especially composite propellants | ||
[1989/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.1990 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.04.1990 [1990/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE NATIONALE DES POUDRES ET EXPLOSIFS 12, quai Henri IV F-75181 Paris Cédex 04 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/37] | For all designated states SOCIETE NATIONALE DES POUDRES ET EXPLOSIFS 12, quai Henri IV F-75181 Paris Cédex 04 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Perotto, Christian 1, rue Gay Lussac F-91610 Ballancourt / FR | 02 /
Ragon, Philippe 5, Résidence Theuillerie F-91130 Ris-Orangis / FR | [1989/18] |
Former [1986/37] | 01 /
Perotto, Christian 1, rue Gay Lussac F-91610 Ballancourt / FR | ||
02 /
Ragon, Philippe 5, Résidence Theuillerie F-91130 Ris Orangis / FR | Application number, filing date | 86400307.4 | 13.02.1986 | [1986/37] | Priority number, date | FR19850002796 | 27.02.1985 Original published format: FR 8502796 | [1986/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0194180 | Date: | 10.09.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0194180 | Date: | 03.05.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C06B45/10, C06B21/00 | [1986/37] | CPC: |
C06B21/0075 (EP,US);
C06B45/00 (KR);
C06B45/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, SE [1986/37] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur lösungsmittelfreien Herstellung von Zusammensetzungen für pyrotechnische Erzeugnisse mit wärmehärtbarem Bindemittel | [1989/18] | English: | Process for the solventless production of pyrotechnical products having a thermosetting binder | [1989/18] | French: | Procédé de fabrication sans solvants de produits pyrotechniques composites à liant thermodurcissable | [1989/18] |
Former [1986/37] | Verfahren zur lösungsmittelfreien Herstellung von Zusammensetzungen für pyrotechnische Erzeugnisse mit wärmehärtbarem Bindemittel und danach hergestellte Produkte, insbesondere Komposittreibstoffe | ||
Former [1986/37] | Process for the solventless production of pyrotechnical products having a thermosetting binder, and products made by this process, especially composite propellants | ||
Former [1986/37] | Procédé de fabrication sans solvant de produits pyrotechniques compositions à liant thermodurcissable et produits ainsi obtenus, notamment poudres propulsives composites | Examination procedure | 16.02.1987 | Examination requested [1987/17] | 22.01.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 09.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 21.09.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.02.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2073764 (HERCULES INC); | [A]FR2427317 (HERCULES INC [US]); | [A]FR2225979 (FRANCE ETAT [FR]); | [A]US4456493 (BARNES MICHAEL W [US], et al); | [A]US4267132 (HENDERSON LARRY D, et al) |