EP0197834 - Process and apparatus for drying a gas under pressure by an adsorbent, and regeneration of this adsorbent by the gas [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.10.1987 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states T.G.I. Traitement de Gaz et Génie Industriel 284 rue de la Garenne 92003 Nanterre / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/42] | For all designated states T.G.I. Traitement de Gaz et Génie Industriel 284 rue de la Garenne F-92003 Nanterre / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pallier, Gaston T.G.I. TRAITEMENT DE GAZ ET GENIE IND. Zone Ind. Les Gâtines B.P 54 F-78372 Plaisir Cedex / FR | [1986/42] | Representative(s) | Combe, André, et al CABINET BEAU DE LOMENIE 55, rue d'Amsterdam 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/42] | Combe, André, et al CABINET BEAU DE LOMENIE 55, rue d'Amsterdam F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 86400621.8 | 25.03.1986 | [1986/42] | Priority number, date | FR19850004855 | 29.03.1985 Original published format: FR 8504855 | [1986/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0197834 | Date: | 15.10.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/04, B01D53/26 | [1986/42] | CPC: |
B01D53/047 (EP);
B01D53/261 (EP);
B01D2253/102 (EP);
B01D2257/80 (EP);
B01D2259/40022 (EP);
B01D2259/40045 (EP);
B01D2259/40052 (EP);
B01D2259/40081 (EP);
B01D2259/403 (EP);
B01D2259/404 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/42] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Trocknung von Druckgas durch ein Adsorptionsmittel und Regenerierung dieses Adsorptionsmittels durch das Gas | [1986/42] | English: | Process and apparatus for drying a gas under pressure by an adsorbent, and regeneration of this adsorbent by the gas | [1986/42] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour réaliser le séchage de gaz sous pression au moyen d'un adsorbant et régénération dudit adsorbant par le gaz | [1986/42] | File destroyed: | 02.07.1993 | Examination procedure | 16.04.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/50] | 13.07.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1987/50] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2380063 ; | [A]FR2190501 |